U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Hale v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 12, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 21, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.