U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Barela v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Honor Conservation Camp Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Financial Entry]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • March 06, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 06, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for In Camera Inspections]
  • November 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2019: [In Camera Inspections]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 09, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • May 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 09, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2019: [Letter(s)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Brief]
  • April 25, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Response]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.