U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02041
  • Case Name: Royal v. Ally Financial
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacate]
  • December 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
January, 2019
  • January 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • January 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.