U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Burrus v. Toussaint et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 07, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 18, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • December 16, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 13, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 12, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 06, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.