U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Brown v. Asselin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 11, 2020: [Opposition]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 28, 2020: [Compel]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 03, 2020: [Reply Brief]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 11, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Strike]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • July 05, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 20, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • April 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 26, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.