U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Campbell County Hospital District v. Lantz-Boggio Architects PC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • March 14, 2019: [Response]
  • March 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Response]
  • February 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 22, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • February 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • February 08, 2019: [Response]
  • February 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 01, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • January 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 29, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Complexity]
  • January 25, 2019: [Brief]
  • January 25, 2019: [Remand]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Removal]
  • January 22, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • January 22, 2019: [Complaint]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.