U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-02002
  • Case Name: Bailey et al v. ANB Bank
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • October 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Order]
  • September 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • September 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
February, 2019
  • February 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.