U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20027
  • Case Name: Billy Dee Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Transmittal of Unclaimed Funds]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
October, 2022
  • October 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • August 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacating Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to Claim]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Declaration]
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule A/B]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacating Order]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • December 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exhibit]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Addendum]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Joinder]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exhibit]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Witness List]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Expedite Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Expediting Hearing]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Generic Motion]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Addendum]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • September 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacating Order]
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Joinder]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • June 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2020
  • May 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Convert Case to 13]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Declaration]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule A/B]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clarify]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacating Order]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Complaint]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Subpoena Issued]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compel]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Generic Motion]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clarify]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Subpoena Issued]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • July 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • July 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Stay]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
June, 2019
  • June 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Complaint]
  • June 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Complaint]
  • June 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Addendum]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reply]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Addendum]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Subpoena Issued]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reply]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.