U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20031
  • Case Name: Chad Houston Powell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Trustees Motion to Dismiss Case]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case - Trustee]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim(s)]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Limit Notice ]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Limit Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.