U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Staumbaugh et al v. Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 16, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • December 16, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 11, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 04, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 03, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • December 03, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Strike]
  • November 27, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 26, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • November 26, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 24, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply to Response]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 27, 2019: [Response]
  • August 06, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.