U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Jones v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • March 10, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 05, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 05, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 08, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Letter(s)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 28, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.