U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Rowe v. Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 24, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 05, 2020: [Witness List]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 14, 2020: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Brief]
  • April 15, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2019: [Vacate]
  • September 06, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 05, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 04, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.