U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 03, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 02, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 08, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Status Report]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 14, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 10, 2019: [Status Report Order]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Intervene]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • February 11, 2019: [Financial Entry]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 29, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.