U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20038
  • Case Name: Shane Matthew Green
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.