U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20040
  • Case Name: Sean Christopher Horton and Wendy Lee Horton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended Order]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Social Security Number]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.