U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Bronnenberg v. Eggar et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • May 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 04, 2019: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 26, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 26, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 12, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 11, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 25, 2019: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 14, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 04, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Service of Process]
  • January 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 30, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.