U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20042
  • Case Name: Donald D Clark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compensation]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compensation]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Writ Issued]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Addendum]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.