U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Sterkel et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 12, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 12, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • June 07, 2019: [Bifurcate]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 02, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • February 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.