U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Harvey et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 03, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 15, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Minute Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Status Report Order]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 12, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • March 11, 2019: [Response]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 01, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Removal]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 27, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 26, 2019: [Brief]
  • February 26, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • February 26, 2019: [Opposition]
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 12, 2019: [Compel]
  • February 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • February 06, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 06, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • February 06, 2019: [Complaint]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.