U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Shostak et al v. Wallers Trucking Company Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 14, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 18, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 17, 2020: [Strike]
  • February 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 14, 2020: [In Limine]
  • February 07, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Non-Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2020: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2020: [In Limine]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Reply]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 27, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • December 26, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 20, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 16, 2019: [Response]
  • December 13, 2019: [Response]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 11, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 18, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 15, 2019: [Witness List]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 03, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 08, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Complaint]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.