U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20051
  • Case Name: Kody Lee LaCount and Douglas David LaCount
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Take Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Waive Pay Order]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Waive Pay Order]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule J]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule J]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule I]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule I]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule H]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule H]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule G]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule G]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule D]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule D]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule E/F]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule E/F]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule C]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule C]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule A/B]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule A/B]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.