U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Counts v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Former Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [USCA Order (Financial)]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 27, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 26, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2020: [Financial Entry]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Letter(s)]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 12, 2019: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.