U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Marguerite Brown Smith Trust v. Devon Energy Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • March 06, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 21, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • February 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 14, 2019: [Removal]
  • February 14, 2019: [Complaint]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.