U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20065
  • Case Name: Cody J Baker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.