U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Mosher v Herrell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 30, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • December 18, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 10, 2019: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 26, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 26, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Appendix]
  • August 21, 2019: [Brief]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Appendix]
  • July 23, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 22, 2019: [Brief]
  • July 22, 2019: [Appendix]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • May 01, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Supplemental Designation]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.