U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00038
  • Case Name: SMCG LLC v. Zenith Education Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 13, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 27, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • February 27, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Removal]
  • February 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • February 20, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 20, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • February 20, 2019: [Complaint]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.