U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Kirscher v. Wagner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 08, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 08, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Verdict]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 01, 2021: [Objection]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Supplement]
  • June 28, 2021: [Designation]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 11, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • June 11, 2021: [Response]
  • June 10, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Objection]
  • May 28, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 19, 2021: [Supplement]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • April 30, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 04, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 02, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 17, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 24, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Objection]
  • February 12, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • February 11, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 29, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 06, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 27, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 03, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • September 03, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • September 03, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 28, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • August 06, 2019: [Lift Stay]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • July 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Lift Stay]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 04, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • April 23, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2019: [Praecipe]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • February 22, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • February 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 22, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • February 22, 2019: [Removal]
  • February 20, 2019: [Complaint]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.