U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Webb v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 08, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 27, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 24, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 24, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 20, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • July 10, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • July 08, 2019: [Strike]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2019: [Response]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Substitute Party]
  • May 20, 2019: [Substitute Party]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Response]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Letter(s)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 21, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • February 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 21, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.