U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20073
  • Case Name: Earl D. Manous and Shirley J. Manous
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Transmittal of Unclaimed Funds]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
October, 2019
  • October 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Proposed Order]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auctioneers Statement of Property Sold]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.