U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cv-00254
  • Case Name: Sinclair Oil Corporation v. OneOK Energy Services Company LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 19, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 06, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply to Response]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 26, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 08, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 29, 2019: [Brief]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 03, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 03, 2019: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.