U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20075
  • Case Name: Renee Ellen Michelena
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended List of Creditors (Fee)]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Take Notice]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Convert Case From 13 to 7]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
February, 2020
  • February 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan - Case Upload]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.