U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Lennen et al v. Casper WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 13, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • July 09, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 09, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • July 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 06, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • June 03, 2021: [Errata]
  • June 03, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Response]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 12, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 01, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 24, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Protective Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 29, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 07, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 08, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • February 26, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • February 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.