U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Lundahl v. Better Mortgage Corporation CEO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 06, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • March 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 06, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 06, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 05, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Removal]
  • February 27, 2019: [Complaint]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.