U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-02003
  • Case Name: Royal v. Corbett et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Entry of Default]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Payment]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.