U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20083
  • Case Name: Michael S. Mayville and Kylee M. Mayville
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Transfer of Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Affidavit]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2020
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Transfer of Claim]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • July 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2019
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacating Order]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.