U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20085
  • Case Name: Stephanie J Dahlke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Time]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Time]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Time]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.