U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Heinemann v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Medium Correctional Institution Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • June 10, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 10, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 29, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 29, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.