U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20092
  • Case Name: Delano L Lee and Daisy May Lee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule I]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule G]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule E/F]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule D]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule C]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule A/B]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Disk]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Take Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Document]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Social Security Number]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.