U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Nutrition Center Inc v. King Bio Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 01, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Witness List]
  • October 01, 2019: [Witness List]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 06, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Errata]
  • May 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 01, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.