U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-02004
  • Case Name: Nation v. Great Lakes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Notice of Intent to Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
  • March 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.