U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20102
  • Case Name: Randell Rolly Redland and Debra Diane Redland
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 12 Trustees Final Report and Account ]
May, 2021
  • May 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Administrative Expenses]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Joinder]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • January 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • December 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Generic Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Affidavit]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exhibit]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reply]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Exhibit]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Generic Motion]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exhibit]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Exhibit]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • November 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Exhibit]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exhibit]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Expediting Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Generic Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Hearing]
  • August 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacating Order]
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Witness List]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Exhibit]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • August 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Joinder]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss Case]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Status Report]
  • April 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order (Generic)]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended List of Creditors (Fee)]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Limit Notice]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Generic Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Limit Notice ]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Limit Notice]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Brief]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Witness List]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Modified Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exhibit]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Brief]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Brief]
  • August 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Protective Order]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Protective Order]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to Debtors Claim of Exemptions]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • July 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 12 Plan]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Joinder]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Joinder]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Turnover of Property]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Witness List]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Addendum]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Expediting Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection to]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Generic Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Response]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection]
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Take Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Amended List of Creditors (Fee)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Employ]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.