U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20103
  • Case Name: James Edward Koch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
January, 2020
  • January 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Dismiss Case]
December, 2019
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Generic Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Convert Case From 13 to 7]
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule E/F]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employ]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • September 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employ]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule E/F]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule J]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule I]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule H]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule G]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule E/F]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule D]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule C]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule A/B]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.