U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Eads v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 01, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Response]
  • January 06, 2020: [Supplement]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Reply to Response]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 23, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 13, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 07, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.