U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20107
  • Case Name: Donald Duane Millard and Penni Ann Millard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedules A B-J]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.