U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Biles v. Schneider et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 12, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • November 11, 2020: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transcript - Non Public]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transcripts]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 25, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 17, 2020: [Status Report Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • September 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Reply to Response]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 14, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 06, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 06, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • August 05, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 04, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 03, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 20, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 17, 2020: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 15, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 26, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 16, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 26, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • July 25, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • July 25, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 25, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • July 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • July 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 05, 2019: [Stay Case]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 19, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • June 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 30, 2019: [Status Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 23, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 16, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • May 09, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2019: [Strike]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 12, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • April 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 27, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2019: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Supplement]
  • March 11, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.