U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20110
  • Case Name: Sonny Allen Pilcher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Strike]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Generic Motion]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Addendum]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Status Report]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Generic Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Generic Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Take Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.