U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Chesapeake Operating LLC et al v. Sky Blue Enterprises Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 29, 2021: [Response]
  • November 15, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Response]
  • March 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 23, 2021: [Response]
  • February 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Response]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 02, 2021: [Quash]
  • February 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • August 11, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 02, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 03, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Consolidating Case]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2019: [Designation]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 24, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 26, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Payment Entry]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.