U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20116
  • Case Name: Dennis Meyer Danzik
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Document]
August, 2019
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appellee Designation]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Addendum to Record on Appeal]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appellant Designation]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Decision and Order]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Time]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Exhibit]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Witness List]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Exhibit]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Vacate]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Response]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Witness List]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.