U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20120
  • Case Name: Trista Lee Raley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Take Notice]
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.