U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00051
  • Case Name: McCrabb v. Reece
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 05, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 02, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 22, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • July 09, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • March 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.